MT HB229 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Generally revise laws related to campaign finance limits and maximums

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Generally revise laws related to campaign finance limits and maximums

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-26 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-24Senate(S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Judiciary
2013-03-27Senate(S) Committee Vote Failed; Remains in Committee (S) Judiciary
2013-03-19Senate(S) Hearing (S) Judiciary
2013-03-07Senate(S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary
2013-03-07Senate(S) First Reading
2013-02-27House(H) Transmitted to Senate
2013-02-26House(H) 3rd Reading Passed
2013-02-26House(H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2013-02-25House(H) 2nd Reading Passed
2013-02-25House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2013-02-21 (C) Printed - New Version Available
2013-02-21House(H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) State Administration
2013-02-21House(H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) State Administration
2013-01-29House(H) Hearing (H) State Administration
2013-01-17 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2013-01-16House(H) First Reading
2013-01-16House(H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration
2013-01-16House(H) Introduced
2013-01-15 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
2013-01-14 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2013-01-12 (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
2013-01-11 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2013-01-11 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2013-01-11 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
2013-01-11 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2013-01-11 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2013-01-11 (C) Draft Taken Off Hold
2012-12-03 (C) Draft On Hold
2012-11-13 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback