MT HB219 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) State Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) State Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Establish Indigenous Peoples Day in Montana
Title
Establish Indigenous Peoples Day in Montana
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 62 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 62 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 62 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) State Administration |
2019-04-01 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) State Administration |
2019-03-13 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) State Administration |
2019-02-15 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration |
2019-02-15 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2019-02-14 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-02-14 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-02-13 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-02-08 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-02-08 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) State Administration |
2019-02-08 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) State Administration |
2019-02-07 | House | (H) Sponsor List Modified |
2019-01-31 | House | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration |
2019-01-18 | House | (H) Sponsor List Modified |
2019-01-16 | House | (H) First Reading (H) State Administration |
2019-01-16 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration |
2019-01-15 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-15 | House | (H) Introduced |
2019-01-14 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2018-12-20 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2018-12-19 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2018-12-18 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2018-12-17 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2018-12-17 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2018-12-17 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2018-12-14 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2018-12-13 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2018-12-13 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2018-12-12 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-12-12 | (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes | |
2018-12-11 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-11-21 | (C) Draft Request Received |