MT HB206 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment on freedom to choose health care coverage
Title
Constitutional amendment on freedom to choose health care coverage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 68 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 68 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | (S) Died in Process | |
2011-04-02 | (S) 3rd Reading Failed | |
2011-04-02 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-01 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2011-04-01 | (C) Sponsors Engrossed | |
2011-04-01 | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred | |
2011-04-01 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-03-23 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety | |
2011-03-23 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety | |
2011-03-16 | (S) Hearing (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety | |
2011-03-09 | (S) Hearing Canceled (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety | |
2011-02-21 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety | |
2011-02-21 | (S) First Reading | |
2011-02-16 | (H) Transmitted to Senate | |
2011-02-16 | (H) 3rd Reading Passed | |
2011-02-16 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-15 | (H) 2nd Reading Passed | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Human Services | |
2011-02-09 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Human Services | |
2011-02-04 | (H) Sponsor List Modified | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Hearing (H) Human Services | |
2011-01-12 | (H) First Reading | |
2011-01-12 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Human Services | |
2011-01-10 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2011-01-10 | (H) Introduced | |
2011-01-08 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2011-01-08 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2011-01-06 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2011-01-06 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2011-01-06 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2011-01-06 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2011-01-06 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2011-01-05 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2011-01-05 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2010-12-28 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2010-12-10 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2010-12-09 | (C) Draft Taken by Drafter | |
2010-09-10 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2009-11-06 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2009-09-14 | (C) Draft Request Received |