MT HB204 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revising laws relating to liability waivers and releases
Title
Revising laws relating to liability waivers and releases
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Hertz [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-18 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 77 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 89 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate (Y: 67 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 69 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 68 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-18 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 77 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 89 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate (Y: 67 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 69 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 68 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2015-05-05 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2015-04-25 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2015-04-25 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2015-04-24 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-23 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-04-23 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-04-23 | (C) Clerical Corrections Made - New Version Available | |
2015-04-23 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-04-22 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-04-22 | Senate | (S) Returned to House Concurred in Governor's Proposed Amendments |
2015-04-22 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted |
2015-04-22 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted |
2015-04-21 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-18 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate for Consideration of Governor's Proposed Amendments |
2015-04-18 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted |
2015-04-18 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-17 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted |
2015-04-17 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-15 | House | (H) Returned with Governor's Proposed Amendments |
2015-04-13 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2015-04-13 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2015-04-13 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-09 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-04-09 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-04-08 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-04-08 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate |
2015-04-08 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-07 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred |
2015-04-07 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-03-24 | Senate | (S) Returned to House with Amendments |
2015-03-24 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2015-03-24 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-03-23 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-03-21 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended |
2015-03-21 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2015-03-21 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-03-18 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-03-18 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Judiciary |
2015-03-17 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Judiciary |
2015-03-05 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2015-02-07 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2015-02-06 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2015-02-06 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-02-05 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2015-02-04 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-02-04 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-02-03 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-02-03 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed |
2015-02-03 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed |
2015-02-03 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-01-29 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-01-29 | (C) Sponsors Engrossed | |
2015-01-28 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Judiciary |
2015-01-28 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Judiciary |
2015-01-21 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2015-01-13 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-01-13 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-01-13 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2015-01-13 | House | (H) Introduced |
2015-01-08 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-01-07 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-01-07 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-01-07 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-01-07 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-01-07 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-01-07 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2015-01-06 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-01-02 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-01-02 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2015-01-01 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2014-08-20 | (C) Draft Request Received |