MT HB202 | 2009 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee  

Summary

Income tax credit for long-term care insurance

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax credit for long-term care insurance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-04-28 (H) Died in Standing Committee  
2009-03-31 (H) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal  
2009-01-29 (H) Committee Vote Failed; Remains in Committee (H) Taxation
2009-01-26 (H) Hearing (H) Taxation
2009-01-19 (H) Fiscal Note Printed  
2009-01-16 (H) Fiscal Note Signed  
2009-01-15 (H) Fiscal Note Received  
2009-01-14 (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Taxation
2009-01-08 (H) First Reading  
2009-01-08 (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation
2009-01-08 (H) Fiscal Note Requested  
2009-01-07 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically  
2009-01-07 (H) Introduced  
2009-01-07 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester  
2009-01-06 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery  
2009-01-05 (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review  
2009-01-05 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review  
2009-01-05 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically  
2009-01-05 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing  
2009-01-05 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]  
2009-01-05 (C) Draft in Edit  
2009-01-05 (C) Draft in Legal Review  
2008-12-29 (C) Draft to Requester for Review  
2008-12-18 (C) Fiscal Note Probable  
2008-12-18 (C) Draft Request Received  

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback