MT HB190 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establish grant program for early grades dual language immersion programs
Title
Establish grant program for early grades dual language immersion programs
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Fern [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-27 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Not Passed as Amended (Y: 45 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-25 - House - (H) Education Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - (H) Education Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | House | (H) Died in Process |
2017-03-31 | House | (H) Missed Deadline for Appropriation Bill Transmittal |
2017-01-27 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Not Passed as Amended |
2017-01-27 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2017-01-27 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-01-26 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Education |
2017-01-25 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Education |
2017-01-18 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Education |
2017-01-06 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Education |
2017-01-06 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Education |
2017-01-05 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-05 | House | (H) Introduced |
2017-01-05 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2016-12-29 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2016-12-29 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2016-12-22 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2016-12-22 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2016-12-22 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2016-12-22 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2016-12-20 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2016-12-20 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2016-12-19 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2016-12-19 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2016-12-15 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-11-16 | (C) Draft Request Received |