MT HB172 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-19 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-19 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise laws related to post-election audits
Title
Revise laws related to post-election audits
Sponsors
Rep. David Bedey [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-23 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 81 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 76 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 81 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 76 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-19 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2023-04-19 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2023-04-13 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2023-04-12 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2023-04-05 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-03 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2023-04-03 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2023-03-24 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2023-03-24 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2023-03-23 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2023-03-23 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2023-03-22 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2023-03-22 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-03-20 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) State Administration |
2023-03-17 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) State Administration |
2023-03-17 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) State Administration |
2023-01-26 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2023-01-26 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration |
2023-01-25 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2023-01-25 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2023-01-25 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2023-01-24 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2023-01-24 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-01-23 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2023-01-19 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) State Administration |
2023-01-19 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) State Administration |
2023-01-12 | House | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration |
2023-01-12 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-01-10 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2023-01-10 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2023-01-10 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2023-01-05 | House | (H) First Reading |
2023-01-05 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration |
2023-01-04 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2023-01-04 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-01-04 | House | (H) Introduced |
2023-01-03 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2022-12-30 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2022-12-29 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2022-12-29 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2022-12-29 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2022-12-29 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2022-12-29 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2022-12-29 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2022-12-28 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2022-12-28 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2022-12-27 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2022-12-26 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2022-12-26 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2022-12-26 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2022-12-22 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2022-12-22 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2022-12-20 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2022-11-20 | (C) Draft Request Received |