MT HB157 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-27 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-27 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extend school district leasing authority
Title
Extend school district leasing authority
Sponsors
Rep. Zac Perry [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-12 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - (S) Education and Cultural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-24 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - (H) Education Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - (S) Education and Cultural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-24 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - (H) Education Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-27 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2015-02-27 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2015-02-17 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2015-02-17 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2015-02-17 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-14 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-02-14 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-02-13 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-02-12 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2015-02-12 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2015-02-12 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-02-11 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2015-02-11 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-10 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-07 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2015-02-06 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2015-02-02 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2015-01-28 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2015-01-28 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-01-27 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2015-01-26 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-01-26 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-01-24 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-01-24 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-01-22 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-01-22 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Education |
2015-01-21 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Education |
2015-01-16 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Education |
2015-01-12 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Education |
2015-01-07 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-01-07 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-01-07 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Education |
2015-01-07 | House | (H) Introduced |
2015-01-06 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-01-05 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2014-12-29 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2014-12-29 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2014-12-29 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2014-12-29 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2014-12-24 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2014-12-24 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2014-12-08 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-12-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |