MT HB157 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing refundable income tax credit based on property taxes imposed and paid
Title
Providing refundable income tax credit based on property taxes imposed and paid
Sponsors
Rep. Wayne Stahl [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-25 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | (H) Died in Standing Committee | |
2011-03-30 | (H) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal | |
2011-03-29 | (H) Motion Failed (H) Appropriations | |
2011-03-29 | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Appropriations | |
2011-03-28 | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations | |
2011-03-25 | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations | |
2011-03-25 | (H) 2nd Reading Passed | |
2011-03-25 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-03-22 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Taxation | |
2011-03-22 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Taxation | |
2011-01-18 | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation | |
2011-01-12 | (H) Fiscal Note Printed | |
2011-01-10 | (H) Fiscal Note Signed | |
2011-01-10 | (H) Fiscal Note Received | |
2011-01-03 | (H) First Reading | |
2010-12-31 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation | |
2010-12-30 | (H) Fiscal Note Requested | |
2010-12-29 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2010-12-29 | (H) Introduced | |
2010-12-22 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2010-12-22 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2010-12-20 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2010-12-17 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2010-12-17 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2010-12-17 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2010-12-17 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2010-12-13 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2010-12-03 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2010-11-20 | (C) Draft Request Received |