MT HB154 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - (H) Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - (H) Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Review income tax credits
Title
Review income tax credits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-17 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 59 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-28 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 60 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 59 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-28 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 60 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | House | (H) Vetoed by Governor |
2015-04-22 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2015-04-22 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2015-04-20 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-20 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-04-20 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-04-17 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-04-17 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2015-04-17 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2015-04-17 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-16 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2015-04-16 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed |
2015-04-16 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-14 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Taxation |
2015-04-14 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Taxation |
2015-04-14 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation |
2015-04-01 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation |
2015-04-01 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-03-31 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2015-03-30 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-03-30 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-03-28 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-03-28 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-03-27 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-03-26 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-03-26 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2015-03-25 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-03-24 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-03-24 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Taxation |
2015-03-24 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Taxation |
2015-01-31 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-01-30 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-01-29 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2015-01-29 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-01-29 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2015-01-28 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-01-28 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-01-27 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-01-26 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-01-24 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Taxation |
2015-01-23 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Taxation |
2015-01-14 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation |
2015-01-13 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed (H) Taxation |
2015-01-13 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed (H) Taxation |
2015-01-13 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received (H) Taxation |
2015-01-07 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-01-06 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-01-06 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2015-01-06 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-01-06 | House | (H) Introduced |
2015-01-06 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2014-12-22 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2014-12-16 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2014-12-16 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2014-12-15 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2014-12-15 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2014-12-12 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2014-12-11 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2014-12-11 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2014-12-10 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2014-11-24 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-11-24 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2014-11-07 | (C) Draft Request Received |