MT HB15 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - (H) Hearing (H) Local Government
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Hearing: Jan 24 @ 3:00 pm in Room 472
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revise laws related to nonmotorized vehicle and mobile home disposal

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise laws related to nonmotorized vehicle and mobile home disposal

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-24House(H) Hearing (H) Local Government
2019-01-08House(H) First Reading (H) Local Government
2019-01-08House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Local Government
2019-01-08 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2019-01-07House(H) Introduced
2019-01-07 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
2019-01-05 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2019-01-04 (C) Executive Director Final Review
2019-01-03 (C) Draft in Assembly
2019-01-03 (C) Executive Director Review
2019-01-03 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2019-01-03 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2019-01-02 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2019-01-02 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
2019-01-02 (C) Draft in Edit
2018-12-31 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2018-12-19 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2018-12-04 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback