MT HB130 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - (C) Printed - New Version Available
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Generally revise laws related to alternative project delivery contracts

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Generally revise laws related to alternative project delivery contracts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - (H) Business and Labor Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16 (C) Printed - New Version Available
2021-02-16Senate(S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
2021-02-16Senate(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
2021-02-12Senate(S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
2021-02-04Senate(S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
2021-02-04Senate(S) First Reading
2021-02-03House(H) Transmitted to Senate
2021-02-03House(H) 3rd Reading Passed
2021-02-03House(H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2021-02-02House(H) 2nd Reading Passed
2021-02-02House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2021-01-29House(H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Business and Labor
2021-01-29House(H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Business and Labor
2021-01-27House(H) Hearing (H) Business and Labor
2021-01-26 (C) Amendments Available
2021-01-14House(H) Fiscal Note Printed
2021-01-13House(H) Fiscal Note Signed
2021-01-13House(H) Fiscal Note Received
2021-01-07 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2021-01-07House(H) First Reading (H) Business and Labor
2021-01-07House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Business and Labor
2021-01-07House(H) Fiscal Note Requested
2021-01-07House(H) Introduced
2020-12-31 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2020-12-31 (C) Executive Director Final Review
2020-12-31 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2020-12-23 (C) Draft in Assembly
2020-12-23 (C) Executive Director Review
2020-12-22 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2020-12-22 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2020-12-22 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2020-12-22 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
2020-12-16 (C) Draft in Edit
2020-12-12 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2020-12-12 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2020-12-12 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2020-12-12 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2020-12-11 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2020-12-03 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2020-11-27 (C) Draft Taken Off Hold
2020-11-16 (C) Draft On Hold
2020-11-11 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2020-10-15 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback