MT HB126 | 2009 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-18 - Chapter Number Assigned  

Summary

Authorize Dept of Admin to determine workers' comp policy for all state agencies

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize Dept of Admin to determine workers' comp policy for all state agencies

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-03-18 Chapter Number Assigned  
2009-03-17 (H) Signed by Governor  
2009-03-11 (H) Transmitted to Governor  
2009-03-11 (S) Signed by President  
2009-03-10 (H) Signed by Speaker  
2009-03-10 (H) Returned from Enrolling  
2009-03-09 (C) Printed - New Version Available  
2009-03-09 (H) Sent to Enrolling  
2009-03-07 (S) Returned to House  
2009-03-07 (S) 3rd Reading Concurred  
2009-03-07 (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading  
2009-03-06 (S) 2nd Reading Concurred on Voice Vote  
2009-03-06 (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading  
2009-03-03 (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
2009-03-03 (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
2009-03-03 (S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
2009-02-23 (S) First Reading  
2009-02-21 (S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
2009-01-16 (H) Transmitted to Senate  
2009-01-16 (H) 3rd Reading Passed  
2009-01-16 (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading  
2009-01-15 (H) 2nd Reading Passed  
2009-01-15 (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading  
2009-01-14 (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Business and Labor
2009-01-14 (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Business and Labor
2009-01-12 (H) Hearing (H) Business and Labor
2009-01-05 (H) First Reading  
2008-12-23 (H) Referred to Committee (H) Business and Labor
2008-12-19 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically  
2008-12-19 (H) Introduced  
2008-12-18 (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent  
2008-12-10 (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent  
2008-12-09 (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review  
2008-12-09 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review  
2008-12-08 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically  
2008-12-08 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing  
2008-12-08 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]  
2008-12-08 (C) Draft in Edit  
2008-12-05 (C) Draft in Legal Review  
2008-12-05 (C) Draft to Requester for Review  
2008-11-25 (C) Draft to Requester for Review  
2008-11-08 (C) Draft On Hold  
2008-10-27 (C) Draft to Requester for Review  
2008-10-24 (C) Draft Taken Off Hold  
2008-10-07 (C) Draft On Hold  
2008-07-15 (C) Draft Request Received  

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback