MT HB120 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-01-29 - (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Fish and Game
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revising laws related to bonus points

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revising laws related to bonus points

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-28 - Senate - (S) Fish and Game Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-29Senate(S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Fish and Game
2021-01-28Senate(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Fish and Game
2021-01-26Senate(S) Hearing (S) Fish and Game
2021-01-21Senate(S) Referred to Committee (S) Fish and Game
2021-01-21Senate(S) First Reading
2021-01-20House(H) Transmitted to Senate
2021-01-20House(H) 3rd Reading Passed
2021-01-20House(H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2021-01-19House(H) 2nd Reading Passed
2021-01-19House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2021-01-15House(H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks
2021-01-14House(H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks
2021-01-12House(H) Hearing (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks
2021-01-06House(H) First Reading (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks
2021-01-06House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks
2021-01-05 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2021-01-05House(H) Introduced
2021-01-04 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
2021-01-03 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2020-12-31 (C) Executive Director Final Review
2020-12-31 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2020-12-16 (C) Draft in Assembly
2020-12-16 (C) Executive Director Review
2020-12-16 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2020-12-16 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2020-12-16 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2020-12-16 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
2020-11-14 (C) Draft in Edit
2020-11-13 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2020-11-13 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2020-11-03 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback