MT HB119 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increase fees for the Hazard Reduction Agreement program
Title
Increase fees for the Hazard Reduction Agreement program
Sponsors
Rep. Denley Loge [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - (H) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - (H) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2019-02-26 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2019-02-19 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2019-02-19 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2019-02-18 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-18 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2019-02-18 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2019-02-14 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2019-02-13 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2019-02-13 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2019-02-13 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-02-12 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2019-02-12 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Natural Resources |
2019-02-06 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Natural Resources |
2019-02-06 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Natural Resources |
2019-01-30 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Natural Resources |
2019-01-30 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-01-29 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2019-01-29 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-01-29 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-01-28 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-01-28 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-01-24 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-01-24 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Natural Resources |
2019-01-23 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Natural Resources |
2019-01-21 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Natural Resources |
2019-01-08 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-01-07 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2019-01-07 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Natural Resources |
2019-01-06 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2018-12-19 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2018-12-17 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2018-12-15 | House | (H) Introduced |
2018-12-15 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2018-12-11 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2018-11-30 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2018-11-30 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2018-11-30 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2018-11-30 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2018-11-30 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2018-11-28 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2018-11-28 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2018-11-27 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2018-11-26 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2018-11-21 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-11-12 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2018-09-17 | (C) Draft Request Received |