MS SR55 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Immediate Release
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

A Resolution Commending The Ripley High School Lady Tigers Basketball Team And Coach Steve Willey Upon Winning The Mississippi High School Activities Association Class 4a State Basketball Championship.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commend Ripley High School Girls Basketball Team for winning MHSAA Class 1A State Basketball Championship.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-01SenateImmediate Release
2020-06-30SenateAdopted
2020-06-29SenateTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2020-06-26SenateReferred To Rules

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback