MS SC666 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Mourning The Loss Of Mississippi-born Author Lewis "buddy" Nordan Of Itta Bena.
Title
Mourn the loss of Mississippi-born author Lewis Nordan.
Sponsors
Sen. David Blount [D] | Sen. Deborah Dawkins [D] | Sen. John Horhn [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Sen. David Jordan [D] | Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-01 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-29 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-29 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-05-01 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-05-01 | Immediate Release | |
2012-05-01 | Adopted | |
2012-04-30 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-04-29 | Referred To Rules | |
2012-04-29 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-04-29 | Immediate Release | |
2012-04-29 | Adopted | |
2012-04-28 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-04-24 | Referred To Rules |