MS SC665 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

A Concurrent Resolution Designating March 2019 As "intellectual And Developmental Disabilities Awareness Month" In Mississippi.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designate March 2019 as "Intellectual and Developmental Disabilities Awareness Month."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseDied On Calendar
2019-03-29HouseTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2019-03-26HouseReferred To Rules
2019-03-25SenateTransmitted To House
2019-03-25SenateImmediate Release
2019-03-25SenateAdopted
2019-03-22SenateTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2019-03-21SenateReferred To Rules

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback