MS SC658 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Public Career And Recognizing The Lasting Legacy Of Senator Tommy Gollott, Who Is The Longest-serving State Lawmaker In Mississippi History, On The Occasion Of His Retirement.
Title
Recognizing the lasting legacy of Senator Tommy Gollott, who is the longest-serving state lawmaker in Mississippi history.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-22 - House - House Adopted (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-22 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-22 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-03-22 | House | Adopted |
2019-03-21 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred To Rules |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Referred To Rules |