MS SC652 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A Concurrent Resolution To Acknowledge That March 30, 2019, Is "national Doctors' Day" And To Recognize The Service Of The Doctors Of The Day Serving The Mississippi Legislature During The 2019 Regular Session.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Acknowledge March 30, 2019, as "National Doctors' Day."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - House - House Adopted (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-04-08SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-04-01HouseReturned For Enrolling
2019-03-29HouseAdopted
2019-03-29HouseTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2019-03-26HouseReferred To Rules
2019-03-25SenateTransmitted To House
2019-03-25SenateImmediate Release
2019-03-25SenateAdopted
2019-03-22SenateTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2019-03-19SenateReferred To Rules

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback