MS SC641 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing The Legacy Of Educational Opportunities For Students Achieved By Dr. Charles Lynn Weathersby Upon The Occasion Of His Retirement As Superintendent Of Education For Rankin County Schools.
Title
Commend educational legacy of Dr. Lynn Weathersby on his retirement as Superintendent of Education of Rankin County Schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-28 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-29 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2015-03-28 | House | Immediate Release |
2015-03-28 | House | Adopted |
2015-03-27 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-03-25 | House | Referred To Rules |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Referred To Rules |