MS SC638 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Booneville High School "lady Devils" Girls Basketball Team And Coach Michael Smith For Winning The Mhsaa Class 3a State Championship.
Title
Commend Booneville High School "Lady Devils" Girls Basketball Team for winning Class 3A State Title.
Sponsors
Sen. J.P. Wilemon [D] | Sen. Juan Barnett [D] | Sen. Joey Fillingane [R] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] |
Sen. Chad Mcmahan [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-30 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-03-30 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-03-30 | House | Immediate Release |
2016-03-30 | House | Adopted |
2016-03-30 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-03-29 | House | Referred To Rules |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Adopted |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Rules |