MS SC636 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Natchez High School "lady Bulldogs" Girls Basketball Team And Head Coach Alphaka Moore For Winning Their Second Straight Mhsaa Class 5a State Championship.
Title
Commend Natchez High School "Lady Bulldogs" Girls Basketball Team for winning second straight Class 5A State Championship.
Sponsors
Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Joey Fillingane [R] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. Kenneth Jones [D] |
Sen. Perry Lee [R] | Sen. Sollie Norwood [D] | Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-27 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-27 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2015-03-27 | House | Immediate Release |
2015-03-27 | House | Adopted |
2015-03-26 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-03-25 | House | Referred To Rules |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Referred To Rules |