MS SC634 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Designating Friday, April 21, 2017, As "donate Life Day In Mississippi" And Encourage Citizens To Wear Blue And Green To Promote The Success Of Organ, Eye And Tissue Transplantation.
Title
Designate April 21, 2017, as "Donate Life Day in Mississippi" to promote organ, eye and tissue transplantation.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Harkins [R] | Sen. Dean Kirby [R] | Sen. Joey Fillingane [R] | Sen. Terry Burton [R] |
Sen. Chris Caughman [R] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Chad Mcmahan [R] |
Sen. David Parker [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-15 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-03-15 | House | Immediate Release |
2017-03-15 | House | Adopted |
2017-03-14 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-03-10 | House | Referred To Rules |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred To Rules |