MS SC633 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Raymond High School "rangers" Boys Basketball Team And Coach Tony Tadlock For Winning Consecutive Mhsaa Class 4a Championships.
Title
Commend Raymond High School "Rangers" Boys Basketball Team for winning consecutive 4A State Titles.
Sponsors
Sen. Albert Butler [D] | Sen. David Blount [D] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] |
Sen. Sollie Norwood [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - House - House Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-22 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-03-22 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-03-22 | House | Adopted |
2018-03-21 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-03-15 | House | Referred To Rules |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Referred To Rules |