MS SC633 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-08 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-08 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The West Jones High School "lady Mustangs" Soccer Team And Head Coach Chip Gieger For Winning The Mhsaa Class 5a State Championship.
Title
Commend West Jones High School "Lady Mustangs" Soccer Team for winning Class 5A State Championship.
Sponsors
Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Joey Fillingane [R] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. Chris McDaniel [R] |
Sen. Haskins Montgomery [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-04 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-08 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-07 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-04 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-03-04 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-04 | Adopted | |
2011-03-03 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-03-02 | Referred To Rules | |
2011-03-01 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-03-01 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-01 | Adopted | |
2011-03-01 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-02-28 | Referred To Rules |