MS SC632 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing And Congratulating Greg Mcneely Of Clinton, Mississippi, Upon His Selection As 2011-2012 Chairman Of The Mississippi Manufacturers Association.
Title
Recognize Greg McNeely of Clinton, Mississippi, upon his selection as 2011-2012 Chairman of the MS Manufacturers Association.
Sponsors
Sen. David Blount [D] | Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Joey Fillingane [R] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] |
Sen. Haskins Montgomery [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-05 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-09 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-05 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-04-05 | Immediate Release | |
2012-04-05 | Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Referred To Rules | |
2012-03-28 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-03-28 | Immediate Release | |
2012-03-28 | Adopted | |
2012-03-27 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-03-21 | Referred To Rules |