MS SC630 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Failed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

A Concurrent Resolution To Provide Legislative Intent That Daylight Saving Time Shall Be The Year-round Standard Time Of The Entire State Of Mississippi.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide legislative intent that Daylight Saving Time shall be the year-round standard time of the state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseDied In Committee
2019-03-18HouseReferred To Rules
2019-03-14SenateTransmitted To House
2019-03-14SenateImmediate Release
2019-03-14SenateAdopted
2019-03-13SenateTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2019-03-13SenateReferred To Rules

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback