MS SC630 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing The Historic Military Service Of Bradford Clark Freeman Of Caledonia, Mississippi, Who Served With The Famous Easy Company In The Battle Of The Bulge With The 101st Airborne Division.
Title
Recognize historic military service of Bradford Clark Freeman, who fought in the Battle of the Bulge with 101st Airborne Division.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-15 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-03-15 | House | Immediate Release |
2017-03-15 | House | Adopted |
2017-03-14 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-03-10 | House | Referred To Rules |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Referred To Rules |