MS SC628 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-28 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-28 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating Columbia High School For Being Recognized As A "star School" By The State Department Of Education.
Title
Commend Columbia High School for receiving "Star School" designation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-26 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-28 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-03-27 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-03-26 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-03-26 | Immediate Release | |
2012-03-26 | Adopted | |
2012-03-22 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-03-21 | Referred To Rules | |
2012-03-20 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-03-20 | Immediate Release | |
2012-03-20 | Adopted | |
2012-03-19 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-03-19 | Referred To Rules |