MS SC625 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing The Outstanding Career Of Chip Morgan As Longtime Executive Vice President Of The Delta Council On The Occasion Of His Retirement.
Title
Recognize outstanding service of Chip Morgan as Delta Council Executive Vice President.
Sponsors
Sen. Eugene Clarke [R] | Sen. Bob Dearing [D] | Sen. Josh Harkins [R] | Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] |
Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. Walter Michel [R] | Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] | Sen. Willie Simmons [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-20 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-20 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-03-20 | House | Adopted |
2019-03-19 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred To Rules |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred To Rules |