MS SC625 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Bogue Chitto "lady Bobcats" Girls Basketball Team And Coach Christi Terrell For Winning Its Sixth Class 1a State Championship And First Since 1995.
Title
Commend Bogue Chitto "Lady Bobcats" Girls Basketball Team for winning Class 1A State Championship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-30 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-03-30 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-03-30 | House | Immediate Release |
2016-03-30 | House | Adopted |
2016-03-30 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-03-18 | House | Referred To Rules |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Adopted |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Referred To Rules |