MS SC623 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing Osteopathic Physicians And Students For Their Collective Efforts And Dedication To Improving The Health Care Of Mississippi Residents On The Occasion Of National Osteopathic Medicine Week April 15-21, 2018.
Title
Recognize Mississippi's Osteopathic Physicians and students during National Osteopathic Medicine Week April 15-21, 2018.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - House - House Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-22 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-03-22 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-03-22 | House | Adopted |
2018-03-21 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-03-15 | House | Referred To Rules |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Referred To Rules |