MS SC619 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution To Recognize And Commend William C. "w.c." Gorden Upon His Induction Into The Black College Football Hall Of Fame.
Title
Commend "W.C." Gorden for induction into the Black College Football Hall of Fame.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-17 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-17 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2015-03-17 | House | Immediate Release |
2015-03-17 | House | Adopted |
2015-03-16 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred To Rules |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Referred To Rules |