MS SC615 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating Teresa Wells For Being Selected As Instructor Of The Year At The Jefferson Davis Campus Of Mississippi Gulf Coast Community College.
Title
Congratulate Teresa Wells, Jefferson Davis Campus Instructor of the Year at Mississippi Gulf Coast Community College.
Sponsors
Sen. Brice Wiggins [R] | Sen. Joel Carter [R] | Sen. Eugene Clarke [R] | Sen. Dennis DeBar [R] |
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. Joseph Seymour [R] | Sen. Michael Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - House - House Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-12 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-12 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-03-12 | House | Adopted |
2019-03-12 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred To Rules |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred To Rules |