MS SC611 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing The Legacy Of Outstanding Public Service By Ronald Britt After 40 Years Of Service To The State Of Mississippi And Boswell Regional Center.
Title
Recognize 40 years of public service by Ronald Britt at Boswell Regional Center.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - House Adopted (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-15 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-03-15 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-03-15 | House | Adopted |
2018-03-14 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred To Rules |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Referred To Rules |