MS SC611 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Congratulating The Greenwood Leflore Recycling Center For Being Awarded The 2014 Environmental Hero Award By The Mississippi Recycling Coalition (mrc).
Title
Congratulate Greenwood Leflore Recycling Center for 2014 Environmental Hero Award.
Sponsors
Sen. David Jordan [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Lydia Chassaniol [R] |
Sen. Joey Fillingane [R] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. Sollie Norwood [D] | Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-17 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-17 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2015-03-17 | House | Immediate Release |
2015-03-17 | House | Adopted |
2015-03-16 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred To Rules |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred To Rules |