MS SC609 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing And Saluting Mavis Staples Upon Her Receipt Of The 18th Annual "living Blues Magazine" Award For Blues Artist Of The Year And Most Outstanding Blues Singer.
Title
Recognize Mavis Staples as "Living Blues Magazine" Artist of the Year and Most Outstanding Blues Singer.
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Burton [R] | Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Lydia Chassaniol [R] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] |
Sen. Willie Simmons [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-20 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-03-21 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-03-20 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-03-20 | Immediate Release | |
2012-03-20 | Adopted | |
2012-03-19 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-03-16 | Referred To Rules | |
2012-03-16 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-03-16 | Immediate Release | |
2012-03-16 | Adopted | |
2012-03-15 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-03-09 | Referred To Rules |