MS SC608 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A Concurrent Resolution Expressing The Condolences Of The Legislature To The Surviving Family Of Joe Gibbon Of Newton, Mississippi, And Recognizing His Lasting Sports Legacy As One Of The State's Greatest Two-sport Athletes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Express condolences of the Legislature on the loss of Joe Gibbon of Newton, acclaimed two-sport Mississippi athlete.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-25SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-12HouseReturned For Enrolling
2019-03-12HouseImmediate Release
2019-03-12HouseAdopted
2019-03-12HouseTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2019-02-28HouseReferred To Rules
2019-02-28SenateTransmitted To House
2019-02-28SenateImmediate Release
2019-02-28SenateAdopted
2019-02-27SenateTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2019-02-26SenateReferred To Rules

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback