MS SC608 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating Tolar Purvis, Jackson Preparatory School Senior Of Madison, Mississippi, Upon His Receipt Of The 2015 Prudential Spirit Of Community Award As A Distinguished Finalist.
Title
Commend Tolar Purvis for winning the 2015 Mississippi Prudential Spirit of Community Award as Distinguished Finalist.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-17 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-17 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2015-03-17 | House | Immediate Release |
2015-03-17 | House | Adopted |
2015-03-16 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred To Rules |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred To Rules |