MS SC602 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-28 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-28 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Jackson Preparatory School "patriots" Boys Basketball Team And Head Coach David Horner For Winning The Mississippi Association Of Independent Schools Overall Championship, The First State Basketball Title In 14 Years.
Title
Commend Jackson Prep "Patriots" Boys Basketball Team for winning MAIS Overall State Championship.
Sponsors
Sen. David Blount [D] | Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Dean Kirby [R] | Sen. Perry Lee [R] |
Sen. William Longwitz [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-26 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-28 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-03-27 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-03-26 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-03-26 | Immediate Release | |
2012-03-26 | Adopted | |
2012-03-22 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-03-16 | Referred To Rules | |
2012-03-16 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-03-16 | Immediate Release | |
2012-03-16 | Adopted | |
2012-03-15 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-03-08 | Referred To Rules |