MS SC602 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on February 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-18 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on February 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-18 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Professional Career And Community And Civic Service Of Willie Louis Richardson And Acknowledging His Commitment To The State Of Mississippi.
Title
Commend career and community service of Willie Louis Richardson.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-16 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-18 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-02-18 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-02-16 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-02-16 | Immediate Release | |
2011-02-16 | Adopted | |
2011-02-15 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-02-10 | Referred To Rules | |
2011-02-10 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-02-10 | Immediate Release | |
2011-02-10 | Adopted | |
2011-02-09 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-02-09 | Referred To Rules |