MS SC600 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A Concurrent Resolution Establishing February 21, 2017, As Higher Education Appreciation Day, Working For Academic Excellence (headwae), And Setting That Day Apart As A Special Day To Congratulate And Express Appreciation To Representatives Of The Faculty And Students Of Mississippi's Public And Private Universities, Colleges And Community Colleges For Their Outstanding Instructional Guidance And Academic Excellence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designate Higher Education Appreciation Day, Working for Academic Excellence (HEADWAE).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-23 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-07HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2017-03-07SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2017-02-23HouseReturned For Enrolling
2017-02-23HouseImmediate Release
2017-02-23HouseAdopted
2017-02-22HouseTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2017-02-17HouseReferred To Rules
2017-02-16SenateTransmitted To House
2017-02-16SenateImmediate Release
2017-02-16SenateAdopted
2017-02-15SenateTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2017-02-09SenateReferred To Rules

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback