MS SC600 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-08 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A Concurrent Resolution To Join The Citizens Of Tupelo, Mississippi, In Recognizing The Brevard Family B & B Concrete Co., Inc., Upon Its Receipt Of The Regional Rehabilitation Center John "red" Rasberry Humanitarian Award.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognize Brevard Family B & B Concrete Co., Inc., for receipt of Regional Rehabilitation Center Humanitarian Award.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-03 - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-08HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2016-03-08SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2016-03-03HouseReturned For Enrolling
2016-03-03HouseImmediate Release
2016-03-03HouseAdopted
2016-03-02HouseTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2016-02-25HouseReferred To Rules
2016-02-25SenateTransmitted To House
2016-02-25SenateImmediate Release
2016-02-25SenateAdopted
2016-02-24SenateTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2016-02-23SenateReferred To Rules

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback