MS SC600 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on March 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-11 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing And Commending The Dedicated Public Service Of Vickie Hariel On The Occasion Of Her Retirement As Pearl River County Circuit Clerk And For 38 Years Of Courthouse Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognize longtime Pearl River County Circuit Clerk Vickie Hariel on her retirement after 38 years serving at the courthouse.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-09 - House Adopted (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-11HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2015-03-11SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2015-03-09HouseReturned For Enrolling
2015-03-09HouseImmediate Release
2015-03-09HouseAdopted
2015-03-06HouseTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2015-03-06HouseReferred To Rules
2015-03-05SenateTransmitted To House
2015-03-05SenateImmediate Release
2015-03-05SenateAdopted
2015-03-05SenateTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2015-03-03SenateReferred To Rules

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback