MS SC597 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-24 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-24 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Northwest Rankin High School "cougars" Girls Soccer Team And Coach Dean Joseph For Winning Their First Mhsaa Class 6a State Championship.
Title
Commend Northwest Rankin High School "Cougars" Girls Soccer Team for winning first State Championship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-20 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-24 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-02-20 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-02-20 | House | Immediate Release |
2017-02-20 | House | Adopted |
2017-02-16 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-02-13 | House | Referred To Rules |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred To Rules |