MS SC597 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Mourning The Loss And Commending The Life And Public Service Of Former Speaker Of The Mississippi House Of Representatives Timothy Alan (tim) Ford, And Expressing The Sympathy Of The Legislature.
Title
Commend life and public service of former Speaker of the Mississippi House of Representatives Tim Ford of Baldwyn, MS.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-05 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-05 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2015-03-05 | House | Immediate Release |
2015-03-05 | House | Adopted |
2015-03-04 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred To Rules |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Referred To Rules |