MS SC597 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Starkville Academy "lady Vols" Basketball Team And Head Coach Glenn Schmidt For Winning Their First-ever State Championship.
Title
Commend Starkville Academy "Lady Vols" Basketball Team for first State Championship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-20 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-03-21 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-03-20 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-03-20 | Immediate Release | |
2012-03-20 | Adopted | |
2012-03-19 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-03-16 | Referred To Rules | |
2012-03-16 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-03-16 | Immediate Release | |
2012-03-16 | Adopted | |
2012-03-15 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-03-07 | Referred To Rules |