MS SC594 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Gulfport Boys "admirals" Soccer Team And Head Coach Henrik Madsen For Winning Back-to-back Class 6a State Championships.
Title
Commend Gulfport Boys "Admirals" Soccer Team for winning back-to-back Class 6A State Championships.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - House - House Adopted (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-04 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-04 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-03-04 | House | Adopted |
2019-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred To Rules |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred To Rules |