MS SC593 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

A Concurrent Resolution Proclaiming 2020 As The "year To Embrace The Gulf" And Recognize The Gulf Of Mexico's Importance To The Nation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proclaim 2020 as the "Year to Embrace the Gulf."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseDied In Committee
2019-02-28HouseReferred To Rules
2019-02-28SenateTransmitted To House
2019-02-28SenateImmediate Release
2019-02-28SenateAdopted
2019-02-27SenateTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2019-02-13SenateReferred To Rules

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback